EP0832863 - Pressure gradient CVI/CVD apparatus, process, and product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation Four Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, North Carolina 28217 / US | ||
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY 4020 Kinross Lakes Parkway Richfield, Ohio 44286-9368 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Purdy, Mark J. 4547 Larkspur Lane Akron, Ohio 44333 / US | 02 /
Rudolph, James W. 9 Sierra Vista Drive Colorado Springs, Colorado 80906 / US | 03 /
Bok, Lowell D. 12861 Amsterdam Anna, Ohio 45302 / US | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Weber, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1998/14] | Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121035.6 | 16.11.1995 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | US19940340510 | 16.11.1994 Original published format: US 340510 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0832863 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0832863 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832863 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/83, C23C16/04, C23C16/44, C23C16/52, B60T8/32 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
C23C16/45561 (EP,US);
C23C16/04 (KR);
C04B35/83 (EP,US);
C23C16/045 (EP,US);
C23C16/452 (EP,US);
C23C16/45557 (EP,US);
C23C16/458 (EP,US);
C23C16/52 (EP,US);
F16D65/126 (EP,US);
F16D69/023 (EP,US);
C04B2235/614 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
Y10S427/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/21 (EP,US);
Y10T428/213 (EP,US);
Y10T428/218 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249961 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249964 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/14] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Druckfeld CVD/CVI, Verfahren und Produkt | [1998/14] | English: | Pressure gradient CVI/CVD apparatus, process, and product | [1998/14] | French: | Produit, procédé et appareil d'infiltration/dépôt chimique en phase vapeur à gradient de pression | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 23.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95940752.9 / EP0792384 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.04.2002 | BE | 03.04.2002 | CH | 03.04.2002 | LI | 03.04.2002 | NL | 03.04.2002 | DK | 03.07.2002 | SE | 03.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | IE | 18.11.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2004/01] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 18.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 03.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8704733 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]WO8810245 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figure 4; examples 1-3 *; | [A]DE3922539 (SINTEC KERAMIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 12, lines 15-39; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0550058 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 20 *; | [A]US5362228 (VAUDEL SERGE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A] - KOTLENSKY W V, "A REVIEW OF CVD CARBON INFILTRATION OF POROUS SUBSTRATES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL SYMPOSIUM OF THE SOCIETY OF AEROSPACE MAT. AND PROC. ENG, (19710421), pages 257 - 265, 265.01 - 265.14, XP000676004 [A] 1-10 * page 260, column R, line 32 - page 261, column R, line 6 * |