EP0846588 - Vehicle display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | ||
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states C.R.F. Societa' Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damiani, Sergio Via Taggia 38 10134 Torino / IT | 02 /
Deregibus, Enrica Via De Canal 62 10137 Torino / IT | 03 /
Dosio, Norberto Via Gorizia 196 10137 Torino / IT | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1998/24] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97121262.6 | 03.12.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00982 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: IT TO960982 | [1998/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0846588 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0846588 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846588 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/213 (EP);
B60K2360/11 (EP,US);
B60K2360/113 (EP,US);
B60K2360/117 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1999/52] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeug- Anzeigegerät | [1998/24] | English: | Vehicle display device | [1998/24] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage de véhicule | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 07.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2667026 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 15 - line 17 * * page 3, line 3 - line 8 * * page 6, line 14 - line 24 * * page 7, line 19 - line 23 * * figures 2-6,9,10 * [A] 6,7; | [A]US5239700 (GUENTHER CLEMENS [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,10 * column 1, line 12 - line 15 * * column 3, line 29 - line 37 * * column 12, line 7 - line 15 * * column 13, line 45 - line 59 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE4218804 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1-5,8,12,13 * column 1, line 32 - line 47 * * column 2, line 11 - line 21 * * column 3, line 21 - line 39 * * column 3, line 60 - line 63 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 12 * * figure 5 *; | [XA]EP0672892 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9 * column 1, line 40 - line 52 * * column 5, line 18 - line 23 * * column 5, line 18 - line 51 * * column 6, line 34 - line 53 * * column 11, line 38 - line 48 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 6-8,12,13; | [A]EP0704675 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 33, line 32 - line 43 ** figure 1 * |