EP0856925 - Voltage transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2013 | Revocation of patent | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Sachsenwerk GmbH Rathenaustrasse 2 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2012/50] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states AREVA Sachsenwerk GmbH Rathenaustr. 2 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states ALSTOM Sachsenwerk GmbH Rathenaustrasse 2 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states AEG Sachsenwerk GmbH Rathenaustrasse 2 D-93055 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichl, Erwin, Dipl.-Ing. Spessartstrasse 4 93105 Tegernheim / DE | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121281.6 | 04.12.1997 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | DE1997102875 | 28.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19702875 | [1998/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0856925 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0856925 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856925 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/035, H01F27/40, H02B11/26 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
H02B13/0356 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/32] | H02B13/035 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/22] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spannungswandler | [1998/32] | English: | Voltage transformer | [1998/32] | French: | Convertisseur de tension | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2008
21.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE KG Ritz Messwandler GmbH & Co. Horner Landstrasse 302-304 22111 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2008
21.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE KG Ritz Messwandler GmbH & Co. Horner Landstrasse 302-304 22111 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2008
KG Ritz Messwandler GmbH & Co. Horner Landstrasse 302-304 22111 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Knoop, Philipp, et al, et al Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen An der Alster 84 D-20099 Hamburg / DE | 23.12.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.06.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.07.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.12.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 05.12.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/18] | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 23.08.2010 | Appeal received No. T1785/10 | 06.12.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.12.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 05.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | GB | 04.12.2008 | FR | 05.12.2008 | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/30] | NL | 13.02.2008 | |
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
FR | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | NL | 13.02.2008 | |
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | SE | 13.05.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 24.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1700520U (RAUPACH) [X] 1-5,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,12; | [X]DE7400493U (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3430776 (SPRECHER & SCHUH GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4233986 (SACHSENWERK AG) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1019732 (CALOR EMAG) [A] 4,5,13 * columns 2-4 *; | [Y]EP0716488 (RITZ MESSWANDLER KG) [Y] 6,7,12 * abstract * * figures 1,5-7 *; | [E]DE19724553 (RITZ MESSWANDLER KG) [E] 1 * the whole document * |