EP0921181 - Production of propylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINA RESEARCH S.A. Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states FINA RESEARCH S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dath, Jean-Pierre Rue d'Ath, 53 7970 Beloeil / BE | 02 /
Delorme, Luc Avenue des Petits Champs, 10 1410 Waterloo / BE | 03 /
Grootjans, Jacques-François Neerysteenweg, 39 3061 Leefdaal / BE | 04 /
Vanhaeren, Xavier Vieux Chemin de L'Helpe, 63 1332 Genval / BE | 05 /
Vermeiren, Walter Winningstraat, 4 3530 Houthalen / BE | [1999/23] | Application number, filing date | 97121389.7 | 05.12.1997 | [1999/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921181 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/05, C07C4/06 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
C07C11/06 (EP,US);
C10G11/05 (KR);
C07C4/06 (EP,US);
C07C2529/035 (EP,US);
C07C2529/40 (EP,US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C4/06, C07C11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/08] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellung von Propen | [1999/23] | English: | Production of propylene | [1999/23] | French: | Production de propène | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/37] | 05.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.01.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.01.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0109059 (MONTEDIPE SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,13 * claims 1,2,5,8 * * page 3, line 13 - line 19 * * tables 1-4 *; | [A]US5043307 (BOWES EMMERSON [US], et al) [A] 1,11,13 * claims 1-4,7,10,11 ** column 9, line 57 - line 65 *; | [X]EP0534142 (CHEVRON RES & TECH [US]) [X] 1-4,10,12-14 * claims 1-3,19 * * page 3, line 43 - line 48 * * page 4, line 54 - line 55 * * page 9, line 17 - line 30 * |