EP0834379 - Lathe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Index-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Hahn & Tessky Plochinger Strasse 92 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states INDEX-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG HAHN & TESSKY Plochinger Strasse 92 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Link, Helmut Obere Burgstrasse 43 73773 Aichwald / DE | 02 /
Trautmann, Günther-Heinrich Egelsbergstrasse 7 73230 Kirchheim / DE | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121623.9 | 09.02.1996 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | DE1995104371 | 10.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19504371 | [1998/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0834379 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0834379 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0834379 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q39/04, B23Q5/40, B23Q1/62 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
B23Q39/042 (EP);
B23B29/03432 (EP);
B23Q5/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/15] | B23Q39/04, B23Q5/40 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehmaschine | [1998/15] | English: | Lathe | [1998/15] | French: | Tour | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96904031.0 / EP0755316 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0433722 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * column 5, line 22 - column 7, line 11; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE3703173 (JAUCH KURT) [A] 1 * column 7, line 32 - line 39 * * column 8, line 22 - line 51; figures 1A-6 *; | [A]DE3002647 (WERKZEUGMASCH OKT VEB) [A] 1 * abstract * |