EP0848987 - Hollow fiber module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saxonia Medical GmbH J.-Gagarin-Strasse 13 01454 Radeberg / DE | [1998/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lüning, Rudolph Am Rischen 5d 37083 Göttingen / DE | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Ilberg, Roland, et al Ilberg - Weissfloh Patentanwälte Am Weissiger Bach 93 01328 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Ilberg, Roland W., Dipl.-Ing., et al Ilberg - Weissfloh Patentanwälte, Am Weissiger Bach 93 01474 Schonfeld-Weissig / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121631.2 | 09.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | DE1996152695 | 18.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19652695 | [1998/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848987 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848987 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/02, A61M1/18 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
F28F21/062 (EP);
B01D63/033 (EP,US);
B01D2313/10 (EP);
B01D2319/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT, SE [1998/52] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hohlfasermodul | [1998/26] | English: | Hollow fiber module | [1998/26] | French: | Modules à fibres creuses | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 03.03.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0186293 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [XA]DE3805414 ; | [A]EP0464737 (ASAHI MEDICAL CO [JP]) |