EP0881469 - Absolute position encoder having incremental and index tracks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venugopal, Prasad V. 737 E. E1 Camino, Apt. 418 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 02 /
Jiang, Nan 816 Grunion Terr Fremont, CA 94536 / US | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [1998/49] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe & Zimmermann, Patentanwälte, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121687.4 | 09.12.1997 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | US19970866033 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 866033 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881469 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881469 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/245, H03M1/00 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
H03M1/308 (EP,US);
G01D5/2455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/32] |
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kodierer für absolute Position mit inkrementalen und absoluten Spuren | [1998/49] | English: | Absolute position encoder having incremental and index tracks | [1998/49] | French: | Codeur de position absolue avec des pistes incrémentales et absolues | [2002/35] |
Former [1998/49] | Codeur de position absolue avec des pistes incrémentale et absolue | Examination procedure | 12.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4628298 (HAFLE RALPH S [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE19532903 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 64 - column 6, line 26; figures 1-5 * [A] 6-9; | [XA]EP0575663 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 22; figure . * [A] 5-9; | [XA]DE4041491 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 55; figure 1 * [A] 4-9; | [A]EP0441963 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 6,7 * the whole document * |