EP0871053 - A method for making fluid optical switches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donald, David K. 17268 Zena Avenue Monte Sereno, CA 95030 / US | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe & Zimmermann Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121692.4 | 09.12.1997 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | US19970842927 | 09.04.1997 Original published format: US 842927 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871053 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871053 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/02 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
G02B26/004 (EP,US);
G02B6/3538 (EP,US);
G02B6/3546 (EP,US);
G02B6/3576 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/25] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung flüssiger optischer Schalter | [2003/25] | English: | A method for making fluid optical switches | [1998/42] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer des commutateurs optiques à fluide | [1998/42] |
Former [1998/42] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines flüssiger optischer Schalter | Examination procedure | 01.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]JPH09133932 ; | [A]JPS59105603 ; | [A]US4589730 (OBU MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 1,10,12 * column A; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0306604 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,12 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 097, no. 009, & JP09133932 A 19970520 (NIPPON TELEGR&) [PA] 1,10,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841012), vol. 8, no. 223, Database accession no. (P - 307)<1660> , & JP59105603 A 19840619 (FUJITSU) [A] 1,10,12 * abstract * | Examination | EP0813088 |