EP0855372 - Method for hydrophilising glass substrates and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Daimler-Benz AG Mercedesstrasse 143 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amberg-Schwab, Sabine, Dr. Heinrich-Grob-Strasse 39 97250 Erlabrunn / DE | 02 /
Schottner, Gerhard, Dr. Raitersaicher Weg 6 91560 Heilsbronn / DE | 03 /
Schmidt-Ihn, Eberhard, Dr. Rüderner Strasse 2/5 73733 Esslingen / DE | 04 /
Voigt, Petra Silcherstrasse 13 72631 Aichtal / DE | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/38] |
Former [1998/31] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121715.3 | 10.12.1997 | [1998/31] | Priority number, date | DE19971002385 | 23.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19702385 | [1998/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855372 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855372 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/30, B05D1/18 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP);
B05D1/185 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
C03C17/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/15] |
Former [1998/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Hydrophilierung von Glassubstraten und deren Verwendung | [1998/31] | English: | Method for hydrophilising glass substrates and their use | [1998/31] | French: | Méthode de hydrophilisation de substrats en verre et leur application | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 10.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.03.2003 | IT | 19.03.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | SE | 11.12.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/40] | GB | 19.03.2003 | |
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 19.03.2003 | |
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3301807 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 7, paragraph L; claims 1,4 *; | [X]JPS5874540 ; | [X]JPS5888145 ; | [X]JPS5888146 ; | [X]JPS5888147 ; | [X]JPS58130138 ; | [X]JPS58130140 ; | [X]JPS58161946 ; | [X]JPS58176143 ; | [X]JPS58176144 ; | [X]WO9510523 (NOF CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract *; | [PX]JPH09301742 | [X] - J. KRON ET AL, "Functional Coatings on Glass using ORMOCER-systems", JOURNAL OF SOL-GEL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY., DORDRECHT NL, (1994), vol. 2, no. 1/2/3, pages 189 - 192, XP000463570 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00486239 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830722), vol. 007, no. 167, Database accession no. (C - 177), & JP58074540 A 19830506 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830813), vol. 007, no. 185, Database accession no. (C - 181), & JP58088145 A 19830526 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830813), vol. 007, no. 185, Database accession no. (C - 181), & JP58088146 A 19830526 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830813), vol. 007, no. 185, Database accession no. (C - 181), & JP58088147 A 19830526 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831027), vol. 007, no. 242, Database accession no. (C - 192), & JP58130138 A 19830803 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831027), vol. 007, no. 242, Database accession no. (C - 192), & JP58130140 A 19830803 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831215), vol. 007, no. 281, Database accession no. (C - 200), & JP58161946 A 19830926 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840112), vol. 008, no. 007, Database accession no. (C - 204), & JP58176143 A 19831015 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840112), vol. 008, no. 007, Database accession no. (C - 204), & JP58176144 A 19831015 (NIHON BARUKAA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 06, Database accession no. 98-058974, XP002063065 & JPH09301742 A 19971125 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [PX] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * |