EP0848147 - Control apparatus for an in-cylinder injection type internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oda, Hideyuki 352, Oshimizu-haitsu, 69-68, Aza Oshimizu Narumi-cho, Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Goto, Kenji, 2-404, Mitsubishi-shataku-nishi 2-1, Uzumasatsuchimoto-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Miyamoto, Masayuki, 105, Park-terrace-Kitakazan 38-1, Obayashi-cho, Kitakazan, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121750.0 | 10.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | JP19960334155 | 13.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33415596 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0848147 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0848147 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848147 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02B27/02, F02B17/00 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
F02B17/005 (EP,US);
F02B27/0215 (EP,US);
F02B27/0257 (EP,US);
F02B27/0294 (EP,US);
F02D33/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/00 (KR);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/008 (EP,US);
F02D41/3029 (EP,US);
F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
F02B2275/18 (EP,US);
F02B27/0273 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0015 (EP,US);
F02D2041/389 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit Direkteinspritzung | [1998/25] | English: | Control apparatus for an in-cylinder injection type internal combustion engine | [1998/25] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour moteur à combustion du type à injection directe | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 14.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9636808 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0355960 (AUSTIN ROVER GROUP [GB]) [A] 2 * page 3, column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 55; figures 7,8; claims 1,16,17 *; | [A]JPS6030418 ; | [A]EP0661432 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 7 * * page 3, column 4, line 4 - column 4, line 50 * * page 4, column 6, line 12 - page 7, column 12, line 9; figures 1,5,8,9,24; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850629), vol. 009, no. 155, Database accession no. (M - 392), & JP60030418 A 19850216 (MAZDA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |