EP0849448 - piston having combustion bowl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/26] | Deep angle injection nozzle and piston having complementary combustion bowl | ||
[1999/17] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, IN 47201 / US | [2006/02] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Cummins, Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, IN 47201 / US | ||
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC. 500 Jackson Street Columbus Indiana 47201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mahakul, Budhadeb 1206 East Lake Road, Apt. 201 Erie, PA 16507-1971 / US | 02 /
Bolis, David A. 3547 N. Morrison Road Nashville, Indiana / US | 03 /
Crane, George E. 1935 California Street Columbus, Indiana / US | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1998/26] | Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr, Weidener, Schüll, Häckel Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121790.6 | 11.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | US19960770145 | 19.12.1996 Original published format: US 770145 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849448 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849448 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02B23/06, F02F3/26 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
F02B23/0669 (EP,US);
F02B23/0696 (EP,US);
F02B2275/14 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
F02F2001/247 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kolben mit geformter Kammer | [1999/17] | English: | piston having combustion bowl | [1999/17] | French: | piston avec cuve | [1999/17] |
Former [1998/26] | Einspritzventil mit Stumpfwinkel und Kolben mit komplementär geformter Kammer | ||
Former [1998/26] | Deep angle injection nozzle and piston having complementary combustion bowl | ||
Former [1998/26] | Injecteur à angle obtus et piston avec cuve à forme complémentaire | Examination procedure | 14.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
22.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Mahle International GmbH Pragstr. 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Pfusch, Volker, et al, et al Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Rotermund + Pfusch Waiblinger Strasse 11 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
22.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Mahle Gmbh Pragstr. 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Pfusch, Volker, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Rotermund + Pfusch Waiblinger Strasse 11 70372 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
22.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Mahle Gmbh Pragstr. 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | 24.01.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.08.2001 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2001 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.05.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.06.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.11.2005 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/08] | Appeal following opposition | 31.07.2002 | Appeal received No. T0837/02 | 03.09.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 29.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2005 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0589178 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 41 *; | [A]US5029563 (HU GUODONG [CN]) [A] 1,5 * figure 4 * * column 2, line 11 - line 47 *; | [A]JPS56106022 ; | [A]JPH06346736 ; | [A]JPH0431651 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811126), vol. 005, no. 187, Database accession no. (M - 098), & JP56106022 A 19810824 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 095, no. 003, & JP06346736 A 19941220 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920515), vol. 016, no. 206, Database accession no. (M - 1248), & JP04031651 A 19920203 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |