EP0856479 - Sorting-accumulator-container for a commissioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WITRON Logistik + Informatik GmbH Neustädter Strasse 21 92711 Parkstein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states WITRON Logistik & Informatik GmbH Neustädter Strasse 21 92711 Parkstein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winkler, Walter Neustädter Strasse 17 92711 Parkstein / DE | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121954.8 | 12.12.1997 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | DE1997201565U | 30.01.1997 Original published format: DE 29701565 U | [1998/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856479 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137, B65G1/04, B65G47/51 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
B65G1/0407 (EP);
B65G1/0485 (EP);
B65G1/1378 (EP);
B65G47/5113 (EP);
B65G2207/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1999/17] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, LI | ||
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Behälter-Sortierpuffer für eine Kommissionieranlage | [1998/32] | English: | Sorting-accumulator-container for a commissioning device | [1998/32] | French: | Conteneur-tampon de triage pour un dispositif de préparationd e commandes | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 06.02.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4306469 (LT ENGINEERING GISIN & URBAN [CH]) [X] 1-4,9-12 * the whole document * [Y] 13,14; | [Y]JPH04116001 ; | [A]DE29507991U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0099340 (COMAU SPA [IT]) [A] 8 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920807), vol. 016, no. 366, Database accession no. (M - 1291), & JP04116001 A 19920416 (ITOKI KOSAKUSHO CO LTD) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * | [A] - LIMMER G, "AUTOMATED SMALL PARTS STORE WITH MODULAR MATERIAL FLOW COMPONENTS", ENGINEERING AND AUTOMATION, (19951101), vol. 17, no. 6, page 12/13, XP000558691 [A] 1,13 |