EP0924899 - Circuit arrangement for a synchronized interchange of data between different locally dedicated signal sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LITEF GmbH Lörracher Strasse 18 79115 Freiburg / DE | [1999/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spahlinger, Günter, Dr. Hagbergstrasse 7 70188 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Ribes, Mauricio Dr. Gremmelsbacherstrasse 4 79199 Kirchzarten / DE | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122204.7 | 16.12.1997 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0924899 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924899 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/417, H04L12/407 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
H04L12/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/09] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum synchronen Austausch von Daten zwischen verschiedenen lokal zugeordneten Signalquellen | [2008/32] | English: | Circuit arrangement for a synchronized interchange of data between different locally dedicated signal sources | [1999/25] | French: | Agencement de circuit pour l'échange de données entre différentes sources de signal localement dédiées | [1999/25] |
Former [1999/25] | Schaltungsanordnung zum synchronen Austausch von Daten zwischen unterschiedlichen lokal zugeordneten Signalquellen | Examination procedure | 25.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.11.2008 | GB | 16.12.2008 | [2010/19] |
Former [2010/05] | GB | 16.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4799052 (NEAR TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column A * * column 2, line 60 - line 66 * * column 3, line 15 - line 37 * * column 5, line 58 - line 68 *; | [X]JPH04287150 ; | [A]EP0389683 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 2 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 20 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 1 *; | [X]JPH05204849 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930222), vol. 17, no. 87, Database accession no. (P - 1491), & JP04287150 A 00000000 (SONY CORP.) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931124), vol. 17, no. 634, Database accession no. (P - 1649), & JP05204849 A 00000000 (SONY CORP.) [X] 1 * abstract * |