EP0855355 - Winding machine and method for the continuous winding of a web of material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/02] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH Postfach 19 70 89509 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preising, Ralf Blumenstrasse 13 89183 Holzkirch / DE | 02 /
Moeller, Roland Obere Gartenwiesen 14 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | 03 /
Thomas, Roland Heilbronner Strasse 75 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [1998/31] | Application number, filing date | 97122390.4 | 18.12.1997 | [1998/31] | Priority number, date | DE1997102715 | 25.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19702715 | DE1997145005 | 11.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19745005 | [1998/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0855355 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0855355 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855355 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/22, B65H18/26 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
B65H19/2207 (EP,US);
B65H18/26 (EP,US);
B65H2301/31642 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41361 (EP,US);
B65H2301/414443 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41468 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/31] | B65H19/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [1999/47] |
Former [1998/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wickelmaschine und Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn | [1998/31] | English: | Winding machine and method for the continuous winding of a web of material | [1998/31] | French: | Machine d'enroulement et procédé pour l'enroulement continu d'un bande de matériel | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 15.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.03.2005 | GB | 09.03.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2006/13] | GB | 09.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3347733 (LENZE GMBH & CO KG AERZEN [DE]) [A] 1,17* page 5, paragraph 6 - page 7; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE4415324 (KLEINEWEFERS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,17 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 49; figure - *; | [A]WO9534495 (VALMET CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1,17 * the whole document * |