EP0849701 - Print control apparatus and print control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/26] | Print control apparatus, print control method, storage medium storing the control program | ||
[2004/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Kunio Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sugaya, Akio Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Miyazaki, Yuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/26] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122396.1 | 18.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | JP19960340837 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34083796 | JP19970046630 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4663097 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0849701 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0849701 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849701 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/02 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
G06T3/14 (EP,US);
G06K15/02 (EP,US);
G06K15/1852 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0065 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/30] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckersteuerungsgerät und -verfahren | [2004/44] | English: | Print control apparatus and print control method | [2004/44] | French: | Dispositif et méthode d'impression | [2004/44] |
Former [1998/26] | Druckersteuerungsgerät und -verfahren, Steuerungsprogramm speicherndes Speichermedium | ||
Former [1998/26] | Print control apparatus, print control method, storage medium storing the control program | ||
Former [1998/26] | Dispositif et méthode d'impression, moyen de stockage de programme de commande | Examination procedure | 19.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.04.2005 | NL | 20.04.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 20.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0398681 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-5,8,11-18,20,21,24-27,29,30,33,34 * abstract * * column 5, line 22 - column 12, line 20 * * figures 1,4,5,7-9 *; | [A]EP0554998 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-5,8,11-18,20,21,24-27,29,30,33,34 * column 4, line 25 - column 9, line 4 * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]EP0659570 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,8,11-18,20,21,24,26,27,29,30,33 * column 3, line 49 - column 10, line 43 ** figures 1,2,6-14 *; | [A]EP0727732 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,7-22,24,26-31,33 * abstract * * column 3, line 37 - column 9, line 49 * |