EP0851261 - Scanning optical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujibayashi, Kazuo Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Hoshi, Koji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 03 /
Kato, Manabu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 04 /
Ishibe, Yoshihiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122397.9 | 18.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960354464 | 19.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35446496 | JP19970078932 | 13.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7893297 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851261 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851261 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851261 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/12, H04N1/113 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
G02B26/125 (EP,US);
G02B13/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/22] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches Abtastgerät | [1998/27] | English: | Scanning optical apparatus | [1998/27] | French: | Appareil de balayage optique | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 18.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57144514 ; | [A]JPS5735825 ; | [A]EP0730182 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,11,20,30 * page 8, line 55 - page 9, line 11 * * page 20, line 30 - page 22, line 23 * * figures 4-6,24 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821207), vol. 006, no. 248, Database accession no. (P - 160), & JP57144514 A 19820907 (CANON KK) [A] 1,11,20,30 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820615), vol. 006, no. 104, Database accession no. (P - 122), & JP57035825 A 19820226 (CANON INC) [A] 1,11,20,30 * abstract * | Examination | US4955682 |