EP0849793 - Improvements in or relating to integrated circuit device packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamson, Michael A. 1207 Church Street Westminster, TX 75485 / US | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/26] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122427.4 | 18.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | US19960033673P | 18.12.1996 Original published format: US 33673 P | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0849793 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0849793 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/13, H01L23/498, H01L23/50 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
H01L23/12 (KR);
H01L23/49822 (EP,US);
H01L23/49861 (EP,US);
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6616 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49109 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1517 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49109, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/03] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserungen für oder in Beziehung auf integrierte Schaltungspackungen | [1998/26] | English: | Improvements in or relating to integrated circuit device packages | [1998/26] | French: | Améliorations pour ou concernant des empaquetages de dispositifs à circuit intégré | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH04184962 ; | [XA]US4626889 (YAMAMOTO MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 2, lines 25-51; figures 5-7 * [A] 17-19; | [XA]EP0614331 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, lines 25-55 * * column 4, lines 1-10; figures 2,3 * [A] 8-19; | [X]JPS60125002 ; | [A]JPH08139281 ; | [A]JPH04218948 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921015), vol. 016, no. 499, Database accession no. (E - 1280), & JP04184962 A 19920701 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-16 * abstract * [A] 17-20 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851112), vol. 009, no. 284, Database accession no. (E - 357), & JP60125002 A 19850704 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 096, no. 009, & JP08139281 A 19960531 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921208), vol. 016, no. 567, Database accession no. (E - 1296), & JP04218948 A 19920810 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |