EP0851114 - Perfected electromagnetic metering valve for a fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/32] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT NEL MEZZOGIORNO Società Consortile per Azioni Via Ex Aeroporto, s.n. 80038 Pomigliano d'Arco, Napoli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricco, Mario Via Ferrannini, 10 70125 Bari / IT | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1998/27] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97122642.8 | 22.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00263U | 23.12.1996 Original published format: IT TO960263 U | [1998/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851114 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851114 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851114 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02, F02M51/00 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
F02M63/0036 (EP,US);
F02M61/18 (KR);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M63/0021 (EP,US);
F02M63/0022 (EP,US);
F02M63/022 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/52] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Dosierventil für ein Kraftstoffeinspritzventil | [1998/27] | English: | Perfected electromagnetic metering valve for a fuel injector | [1998/27] | French: | Soupape électromagnétique de dosage pour un injecteur de combustible | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0404336 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 58; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4749892 (MESENICH GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 *; | [PA]EP0753658 (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [PA] 1,3,5,8,9 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 20; figure 2 *; | [A]US4142683 (CASEY GARY L, et al) [A] 1 * column 16, line 49 - column 19, line 25; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPS61142358 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861119), vol. 010, no. 342, Database accession no. (M - 536), & JP61142358 A 19860630 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |