EP0854086 - Process and device for inserting separation sheets between foodstuff slices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPMA Alpenland Maschinenbau GmbH Alpenstrasse 39 - 41 83543 Rott am Inn / DE | [1999/37] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states ALPENLAND MASCHINENBAU HAIN & CO. KG Alpenstrasse 39-41 83543 Rott am Inn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Einlechner, Markus Heinrichsdorferstrasse 13 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Finsterwald, Martin, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Finsterwald, Martin, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/30] | Finsterwald, Martin, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner, Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122670.9 | 22.12.1997 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | DE1997101340 | 16.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19701340 | [1998/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0854086 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0854086 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854086 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/06, B65B25/08, B26D7/32 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
B65B25/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/30] | B65B25/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, IT, LI, NL [1999/52] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Einbringung von Trennblättern zwischen scheibenförmig aufgeschnittene Lebensmittelprodukte | [1998/30] | English: | Process and device for inserting separation sheets between foodstuff slices | [1998/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour insérer des feuilles de séparation entre des tranches de produits alimentaires | [2000/41] |
Former [1998/30] | Procédé et appareilpour inserer des feuilles de séparation entre des tranches de produits alimentaires | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.11.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8321553U (SCHINDLER &WAGNER) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [A]US5419677 (COHN ROBERT [US]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0736361 (HITECH SYSTEMS SRL [IT]) [A] 1,3-10 * column 3, line 23 - line 48; figures 1,4-6 * |