EP0851317 - Color image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/27] | Color image forming apparatus and method of the electrophotographic type | ||
[2002/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinohara, Hayato Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122909.1 | 24.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960357177 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35717796 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851317 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851317 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851317 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/00, G03G15/16 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G03G15/161 (EP,US);
G03G21/00 (KR);
G03G21/0005 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0174 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/27] | G03G21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/38] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Farbbilderzeugungsgerät | [2002/10] | English: | Color image forming apparatus | [2002/10] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images à couleurs | [2002/10] |
Former [1998/27] | Farbbilderzeugungsgerät und Verfahren vom elektrophotographischen Typ | ||
Former [1998/27] | Color image forming apparatus and method of the electrophotographic type | ||
Former [1998/27] | Appareil de formation d'images à couleurs et procédé de type électrophotographique | Examination procedure | 09.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 06.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.05.2004 | IT | 19.05.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 19.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]JPH09258628 ; | [A]JPH05313457 ; | [A]JPH07168494 ; | [A]JPS6388572 ; | [A]JPH0580676 ; | [A]JPH08334953 ; | [A]EP0488147 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1-3,5; claim - * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 098, no. 002, & JP09258628 A 19971003 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [PA] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940303), vol. 018, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 1703), & JP05313457 A 19931126 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, & JP07168494 A 19950704 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880906), vol. 012, no. 327, Database accession no. (P - 753), & JP63088572 A 19880419 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930803), vol. 017, no. 416, Database accession no. (P - 1584), & JP05080676 A 19930402 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 097, no. 004, & JP08334953 A 19961217 (CANON INC) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |