EP0788774 - High-frequency thrombectomy catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Homsma, Tjeerd De Vennen 5 9302 ER Roden / NL | 02 /
Boudwijn, Alexander Christiaan Oldenoert 124 9351 KS Leek / NL | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1997/33] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 97200308.1 | 04.02.1997 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | NL19961002274 | 07.02.1996 Original published format: NL 1002274 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0788774 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/32037 (EP,US);
A61B17/22012 (EP,US);
A61B17/2202 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00539 (EP,US);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US);
A61B2217/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1997/33] | Title | German: | Hochfrequenz-Thrombectomie-Katheter | [1997/33] | English: | High-frequency thrombectomy catheter | [1997/33] | French: | Cathéter de thrombectomie haute-frequence | [1997/33] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/09] | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5380273 (DUBRUL WILL R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * column W *; | [X]DE3812841 (SCHUBERT WERNER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 36; figure - *; | [X]US4808153 (PARISI TULIO T [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 17; figure - *; | [A]EP0232678 (NERACHER ARNOLD [CH]) [A] 3,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0378691 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 5,6 * figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0442579 (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [DA] 7,8 * abstract *; | [PX]WO9608196 (SOLAR RONALD J [US]) [PX] 1,5 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 16; figure - * |