EP0785055 - Biodegradable resin foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUZUKI SOGYO Co., Ltd. 789 Miyakami Shimizu-shi Shizuoka 424 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states SUZUKI SOGYO Co., Ltd. 789 Miyakami Shimizu-shi, Shizuoka 424 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakanishi, Motoyasu 1461-47 Tenma Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1997/30] | Skailes, Humphrey John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97200618.3 | 13.07.1994 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | JP19930195378 | 13.07.1993 Original published format: JP 19537893 | JP19930199214 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: JP 19921493 | JP19930199215 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: JP 19921593 | JP19930201094 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20109493 | JP19930201095 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20109593 | JP19930232339 | 25.08.1993 Original published format: JP 23233993 | JP19930294198 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: JP 29419893 | JP19930294199 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: JP 29419993 | JP19930294200 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: JP 29420093 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0785055 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0785055 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785055 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00, B29C44/04, C08J11/12, B65D65/46, // B29K105:04 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
B29C44/428 (EP,US);
B29C44/3402 (EP,US);
C08J9/125 (EP,US);
B29C2043/5808 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/30] | B29B17/00, C08J11/12, B65D65/46, // B29K105:04 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/30] | Title | German: | Biologisch abbaubarer Schaumstoff | [1997/30] | English: | Biodegradable resin foam | [1997/30] | French: | Mousse résineuse biodégradable | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 23.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94305110.2 / EP0634261 | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Request for further processing for: | 11.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.10.2002 | Decision despatched | 20.04.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.05.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04356538 ; | JPH04356538 [ ]; | [Y]EP0539604 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [Y] 1,3 * the whole document * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 10 * * page 5, line 45 - page 7, line 14 * * page 15, line 40 - line 50; claims 1-4; table 4 *; | [A]EP0535994 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 54 * * claims 1-9 *; | [PA]EP0594977 (REICHENECKER HANS STOROPACK [DE]) [PA] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [PA]JPH0616857 ; | JPH0616857 [ ]; | [PA]EP0601390 (BASF AG [DE]) [PA] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [PA]US5272181 (BOEHMER EDWARD W [US], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930428), vol. 17, no. 216, Database accession no. (C - 1053), & JP04356538 A 19921210 (SEKISUI PLASTICS CO. LTD.) [Y] 1,3 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 04, Database accession no. 93-030562 (12), & JPH04356538 A 19921210 (SEKISUI PLASTICS CO. LTD.) [ ] * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940421), vol. 18, no. 222, Database accession no. (C - 1193), & JP06016857 A 19940125 (THE NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM. IND. CO. LTD.) [PA] 1,3 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 09, Database accession no. 94-068641 (09), & JPH0616857 A 19940125 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM. IND. CO.) [ ] * abstract * |