EP0795430 - Collapsible tube for car door handles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lab. Radio, S.A. Ctra. Valencia-Ademuz, Km. 28 46160 Lliria (Valencia) / ES | [1997/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baixauli, José Rosa c/ Poeta Antonino Chocoreli, 7 46015 Valencia / ES | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/34] | Hess, Peter K., Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler -Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/38] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 97200717.3 | 11.03.1997 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | ES19960000597 | 12.03.1996 Original published format: ES 9600597 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0795430 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0795430 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0795430 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/055, B60R13/02, F16B5/02 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B60J5/0461 (EP);
B60N3/026 (EP);
B60R21/055 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/38] | B60J5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1997/38] | Title | German: | Verformbahres Rohr einer Handhabe für eine Fahrzeugtür | [1997/38] | English: | Collapsible tube for car door handles | [1997/38] | French: | Tube déformable pour poignées de porte de véhicule | [1997/38] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 08.08.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02005313.8 / EP1225101 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.09.2002 | BE | 18.09.2002 | GR | 18.09.2002 | NL | 18.09.2002 | DK | 18.12.2002 | SE | 18.12.2002 | PT | 19.12.2002 | IE | 11.03.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/15] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
IE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | GR | 18.09.2002 | |
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 18.09.2002 | |
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 18.09.2002 | |
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 18.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7044455U (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph L; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH06270673 ; | [A]EP0044022 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 23 * * page 5, line 28 - line 39; figure - *; | [PA]US5531499 (VECCHIO MICHAEL T [US], et al) [PA] 1,2 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 16 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 41; figures 1-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941222), vol. 018, no. 682, Database accession no. (M - 1729), & JP06270673 A 19940927 (KASAI KOGYO CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |