EP0798850 - Improvements in or relating to radio receivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/35] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1997/40] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dick, Burkhard c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | [2004/42] |
Former [1997/40] | 01 /
Dick, Burkhard c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstra e 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Scott, Kevin James, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Scott, Kevin James, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1997/40] | Moody, Colin James, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97200835.3 | 20.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | EP19960302095 | 27.03.1996 Original published format: EP 96302095 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0798850 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0798850 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798850 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/30, H03G1/00 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
H03G3/3036 (EP);
H03G1/0088 (EP);
H03G3/3052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/40] | Title | German: | Verbesserung in oder bezüglich Radioempfänger | [2004/10] | English: | Improvements in or relating to radio receivers | [1997/40] | French: | Améliorations de ou relatives à récepteurs radio | [2004/10] |
Former [1997/40] | Radioempfänger | ||
Former [1997/40] | Récepteurs radio | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0448071 (PLATH NAUT ELEKTRON TECH) [X] 1,2 * column W *; | [E]WO9736372 (MOTOROLA INC ;PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV (NL)) [E] 1,2 * page 2, line 12 - page 5, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2129053 (THOMSON CSF) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 5 - line 20; figures 1,5 *; | [X]US5161170 (GILBERT PAUL H ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column W * | Examination | EP0464792 |