EP0799701 - A method of maintaining a liquid ink printhead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donahue, Frederick A. 5176 Fosdick Road Walworth, New York 14568 / US | 02 /
Anderson, David G. 1080 Willits Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | 03 /
Hull, Richard A. 3530 Scenic Way Macedon, NY 14502 / US | 04 /
Wafler, Walter F. 43 Wood Hill Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/41] | Johnson, Reginald George Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97200949.2 | 01.04.1997 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | US19960626300 | 01.04.1996 Original published format: US 626300 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799701 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
B41J2/1652 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wartung eines Druckkopfes für flüssige Tinte | [1997/41] | English: | A method of maintaining a liquid ink printhead | [1997/41] | French: | Méthode de maintenance pour tête d'impression à encre liquide | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 21.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/48] | 06.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0714776 (CANON KK) [PX] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0443808 (CANON KK) [X] 1,5 * column 5, line 48 - column 8, line 19; figure 6 * [Y] 2,3; | [YA]EP0589581 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 4 - column 7, line 50; figure . * [A] 6; | [A]JPH02141248 ; | [PA]EP0704307 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [PA] 2 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 37 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900816), vol. 014, no. 379, Database accession no. (M - 1012), & JP02141248 A 19900530 (CANON INC) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |