EP0807883 - Communications system with means for exchanging software processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/35] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1997/47] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauptmann, Steffen, Dr.-Ing. c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Wasel, Josef, Dr.rer.nat. c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97201240.5 | 25.04.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | DE1996117976 | 06.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19617976 | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807883 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807883 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807883 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F9/44 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
G06F8/656 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04L69/32 (US)
|
Former IPC [1997/47] | G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/47] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem mit Mitteln zum Austausch von Softwareprozessen | [1997/47] | English: | Communications system with means for exchanging software processes | [1997/47] | French: | Système de communication avec moyen pour échanger des processus de logiciel | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5155847 (KIROUAC DONALD L [CA], et al) [A] 6 * abstract ** column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 12 *; | [A]EP0587089 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph L - column 2, line 17 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 54 * * column 6, line 51 - line 54 * * column 7, line 32 - line 43 * * column 8, line 14 - line 22 *; | [XP] - HAUPTMANN S., WASEL J., ON-LINE MAINTENANCE WITH ON-THE-FLY SOFTWARE REPLACEMENT, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA ---, PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONFIGURABLE DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, ANNAPOLIS, MD, USA, 6-8 MAY 1996, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS, (1996), XP002134719 [XP] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CDS.1996.509348 | [AD] - APEL U., "ONLINE-SOFTWARE-ERWEITERUNG UND -ÄNDERUNG", ELEKTRISCHES NACHRICHTWESEN, (1990), vol. 64, no. 4, ISSN 1242-0557, pages 327 - 333, XP000901060 [AD] 1,3,7,8 * page 328, column R, line 28 - line 36 * * page 329, column R, line 1 - line 48 * * page 331, column L, line 6 - page 332, column L, line 40 * | [A] - GUPTA D ET AL, "ON-LINE SOFTWARE VERSION CHANGE USING STATE TRANSFER BETWEEN PROCESSES", SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE,GB,JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, (19930901), vol. 23, no. 9, ISSN 0038-0644, pages 949 - 964, XP000655865 [A] 1-3,7,8 * page 953, line 21 - page 955, line 34 * * page 957, line 28 - paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/spe.4380230903 |