EP0813873 - Pharmaceutical composition comprising mirtazapine and one or more selective serotonin reuptake inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [1997/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nickolson, Victor Johannes Hermelijnendreef 25 5342 XC Oss / NL | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Leaper, Lyn N.V. Organon Postbus 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | Leaper, Lyn N.V. Organon, Postbus 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 97201853.5 | 17.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | EP19960201703 | 19.06.1996 Original published format: EP 96201703 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813873 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813873 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, // (A61K31/495, 31:445),(A61K31/495, 31:34),(A61K31/495, 31:135) | [1997/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/495, A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K31/495, A61K31/34 (EP);
A61K31/495, A61K31/445 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/52] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen mit Mirtazapin und einem oder mehreren selektiven Serotonin-Aufnahme Inhibitoren | [1997/52] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition comprising mirtazapine and one or more selective serotonin reuptake inhibitors | [1997/52] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques comprenants de la mirtazapine et un ou plusieurs inhibiteurs sélectifs d'assimilation de sérotonine | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 17.06.2002 | MC | 17.06.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/25] | MC | 17.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0431663 (AKZO NV) [A] 1,4-6,8,9 * column 2; claims 4,7,10 *; | [A]FR2511869 (COUGHLIN SHAUN) [A] 1-5 * pages 3-5; claims 1,6-8 * | [A] - DAVIS, WILDE, "MIRTAZAPINE. A REVIEW OF ITS PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTIC POTENTIALIN THE MANAGEMENT OF MAJOR DEPRESSION", CNS DRUGS, (199605), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 389 - 402, XP000578524 [A] 6-9 * page 398, column L * * page 401, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00023210-199605050-00007 | Examination | - BROEKKAMP C.L.E. ET AL, "Prospects for Improved Antidepressants", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 38, no. 23, doi:doi:10.1021/jm00023a001, pages 4615 - 4633, XP000650299 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00023a001 |