EP0803844 - Coin store [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/44] | Coin Store | ||
[2007/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEI, Inc. 1301 Wilson Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | [2006/33] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states MARS INCORPORATED 6885 Elm Street McLean, Virginia 22101-3883 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bointon, Richard Guy The Firs, Bowden Hill Yealmpton, Plymouth, Devon, PL8 2JX / GB | [1997/50] |
Former [1997/44] | 01 /
Bointon, Richard Guy 12 Longhurst Close Caversham, Reading RG4 0ER / GB | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97202083.8 | 19.05.1994 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | GB19930010636 | 21.05.1993 Original published format: GB 9310636 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0803844 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0803844 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803844 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07F5/24 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G07F11/04 (EP,US);
G07D9/06 (EP,US);
G07F5/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/45] | G07D1/00, B65G60/00, G07F5/24 | ||
Former IPC [1997/44] | G07D1/00, B65G60/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1997/44] | Title | German: | Münzspeicher | [1997/44] | English: | Coin store | [2007/17] | French: | Magasin de pièces de monnaie | [1997/44] |
Former [1997/44] | Coin Store | Examination procedure | 06.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94915627.7 / EP0700553 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 02 | For: | CH DE ES FR GB | Date: | 02.08.2007 | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/07] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | CH DE ES FR GB | ||
Date: | 03.11.2006 | ||
[2007/50] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.08.2007 | LI | 15.08.2007 | FR | 11.04.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2008/14] | CH | 15.08.2007 | |
LI | 15.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO9009646 (COIN CONTROLS [GB]) [X] 1,5,6,8,16 * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 17; figures 1-4 * [A] 7,10,18,19 [Y] 2,3,12,15,17; | [YA]US4403900 (THOMAS PAUL M [US]) [Y] 2,3,12,17 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 48 * * column 7, line 43 - line 56; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,7,10; | [XAY]DE2423688 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 16,18,19 * page 4, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph L; figure - * [A] 12-14 [Y] 15; | [XA]DE4041078 (MEGA SPIELGERAETE ENTWICKLUNGS [DE]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 19; figure - * [A] 2,3,6,7,12,16-19 |