EP0823356 - Control method for variable level airbag inflation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2000/45] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 700 East Firmin Street Kokomo Indiana 46902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Jiyao 3511 Christopher Drive Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97202125.7 | 10.07.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | US19960695814 | 05.08.1996 Original published format: US 695814 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823356 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823356 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/32 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
B60R21/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/43] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Regelverfahren zum Aufblasen eines Airbags auf unterschiedliche Niveaus | [1998/07] | English: | Control method for variable level airbag inflation | [1998/07] | French: | Procédé de commande pour le gonflage à niveau variable d'un cousin d'air | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3836167 (WILSON K); | [Y]WO9113784 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [Y] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4041049 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5400487 (GIOUTSOS TONY [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 41-46 * * column 3, line 13 - column 6, line 8; claims 4,5 * [Y] 3; | [AY]WO9511819 (MORTON INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 14; figure 4 * [Y] 3; | [A]US5497327 (TAKAYA SEIZI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |