EP0881030 - A process for milling the rotor of a turbomolecular pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARIAN S.p.A. Via Varian 54 10040 Leini' (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states VARIAN S.p.A. Via Varian 54 I-10040 Leini (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marzio, Marco C. so Unione Sovietica, 339 10135 Turin / IT | 02 /
Pellizzari, Paolo Strada S. Antonio, 22, Fraz. Bussolino 10090 Gassino T.SE (Turin) / IT | 03 /
Inserra, Dario Via Carducci, 9 10093 Collegno (Turin) / IT | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent, Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97202253.7 | 18.07.1997 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | IT1997TO00454 | 28.05.1997 Original published format: IT TO970454 | [1998/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881030 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881030 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q3/08, F04D19/04 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
B23Q3/086 (EP);
F04D19/042 (EP);
F04D29/321 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/32] |
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Fräsen des Rotors einer Turbomolekularpumpe | [1998/49] | English: | A process for milling the rotor of a turbomolecular pump | [1998/49] | French: | Procédé de fraisage du rotor d'une pompe turbomoléculaire | [1998/49] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 03.06.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.07.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6071138 ; | [A]JPS5999001 ; | [A]US3623826 (MANDELL ARMAN, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 30 - line 50; figure - *; | [A]GB2052317 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * page 2, line 24 - line 41; figure - *; | [A]GB2181374 (KOERBER AG) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]FR2661631 (MAGAUD PAUL) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850827), vol. 009, no. 209, Database accession no. (M - 407), & JP60071138 A 19850423 (AISHIN SEIKI KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840926), vol. 008, no. 210, & JP59099001 A 19840607 (TOSHIBA) [A] 1 * abstract * |