EP0819659 - Hybride glass-polyimide optical waveguide and method for manufacturing this optical waveguide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states NEDERLANDSE ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEPAST-NATUURWETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK TNO Schoemakerstraat 97, P.O. Box 60680 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faber, Anne Jans Marter 20 5508 MP Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
Göschel, Albin Günter Peter Ulrich Ulenpas 5 5655 JA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 97202256.0 | 18.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | NL19961003651 | 19.07.1996 Original published format: NL 1003651 | [1998/04] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819659 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819659 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/02, C03C13/04, G02B6/16, G02B1/04 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
G02B6/02033 (EP);
C03C25/105 (EP);
G02B1/048 (EP);
G02B6/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/048, C08L79/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/18] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hybrid-Glas-Polyimid optischer Wellenleiter und Verfahren zur Herstellung dieses optischen Wellenleiters | [1998/04] | English: | Hybride glass-polyimide optical waveguide and method for manufacturing this optical waveguide | [1998/04] | French: | Guide d'onde optique du type verre-polyimide hybride et méthode de production de ce guide d'onde optique | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/02] | 19.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.05.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5567219 (VACHA LUBOS [US], et al) [PX] 1-8 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 34 * * column 4, line 11 - line 18 *; | [A]EP0617314 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 8, line 32 - line 34 * * page 8, line 50 - line 54 * * page 19, line 5 - line 6 * * page 24, line 9 * * page 25, line 29 - line 30 *; | [A]US5317082 (BEUHLER ALLYSON J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 43 * * column 6, line 3 - line 30 *; | [A]JPS63201031 ; | [A] - MATSUURA T ET AL, "LOW LOSS, HEAT-RESISTANT OPTICAL WAVEGUIDES USING NEW FLUORINATED POLYIMIDES", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19930204), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 269 - 271, XP000336786 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881221), vol. 012, no. 491, Database accession no. (C - 554), & JP63201031 A 19880819 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - BISWAS D R, "OPTICAL FIBER COATINGS FOR BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (19920701), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 1400 - 1403, XP000289258 [A] 1-8 * page 1401, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.57701 |