EP0825724 - Electronic apparatus with electrical energy storage means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/47] |
Former [2008/39] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/09] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patenverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | Schmalz, Günther, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97202490.5 | 12.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | DE1996133664 | 21.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19633664 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0825724 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0825724 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16, H02M3/158 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
H02M3/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/07] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrisches Gerät mit Energiespeicher | [1998/09] | English: | Electronic apparatus with electrical energy storage means | [1998/09] | French: | Appareil électronique avec dispositif d'accumulation d'énergie électrique | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 04.10.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3608082 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH06217532 ; | [X]US5583422 (SCHIRMER KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 12 - line 37; figures 1,2; claim 1 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 30 *; | [X]US4347474 (BROOKS JAMES L, et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract *; | [X]US4618812 (KAWAKAMI CHIKUNI [JP]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 07, & JP06217532 A 19940805 (O KOKKA;NITTA IND CORP) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * abstract * |