EP0833195 - Radiographic elements containing ultrathin tabular grain emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dickerson, Robert Edward, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Tsaur, Allen Keh-Chang, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patents, W92-3A Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patent Departement (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97202864.1 | 18.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | US19960724722 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: US 724722 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833195 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0833195 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/17, G03C1/005 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
G03C1/0051 (EP,US);
G03C5/17 (EP,US);
Y10S430/167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/51] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Emulsionen mit ultradünnen Tafelkörnern enthaltende radiographische Elemente | [1998/14] | English: | Radiographic elements containing ultrathin tabular grain emulsions | [1998/14] | French: | Eléments radiographiques contenant des émulsions aux grains tabulaires ultraminces | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0518066 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-9 * example -; claim - *; | [D]US5252442 (DICKERSON ROBERT E [US], et al); | [A]EP0666497 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [PA]EP0754973 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [PA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0758760 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [PA] 1-9* the whole document * |