EP0839648 - Method for making lithographic printing plates allowing for the use of lower laser writing power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vermeersch, Joan Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Morstel / BE | 02 /
Van Damme, Marc Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Morstel / BE | 03 /
Van Hunsel, Johan Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Morstel / BE | 04 /
Marland, Fred 149 High Street N. Billerica, MA 01862 / US | 05 /
Ziph-Schatzberg, Leah 34 Wesley Street North Andover, MA 01845 / US | 06 /
Michielsen, Joseph Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Morstel / BE | [1998/19] | Application number, filing date | 97203130.6 | 08.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | EP19960203003 | 29.10.1996 Original published format: EP 96203003 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839648 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10, B41M5/36 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
B41M5/366 (EP);
B41C1/1025 (EP);
B41C2210/04 (EP);
B41C2210/06 (EP);
B41C2210/08 (EP);
B41C2210/24 (EP);
B41C2210/262 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung lithographischen Druckplatten unter Verwendung von einem Laser mit einer niedrigeren Schreibleistung | [1998/19] | English: | Method for making lithographic printing plates allowing for the use of lower laser writing power | [1998/19] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de plaques d'impression lithographiques permettant l'utilisation d'un laser à puissance d'écriture inférieure | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 20.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/46] | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]FR1561957 (GEVAERT-AGFA) [DY] 1-7 * page 7, column R, line 34 - line 56; example 12; claim - *; | [YD]US3642475 (VRANCKEN MARCEL NICOLAS ET AL) [YD] 1-7 * column 3, line 74 - column 4, line 5; claim - *; | [YD]EP0664211 (PRESSTEK INC) [YD] 7 * claim - *; | [Y]US3833441 (R.B.HEIART) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 24 - line 32 *; | [YD]US3476937 (VRANCKEN MARCEL NICOLAS) [YD] 1,4 * column 7, line 41 - line 43; claim 1 * |