EP0836806 - Method and apparatus for converting wet organic wastes into animal feed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/17] | Method and apparatus for converting wet organic wasted into animal feed | ||
[1999/24] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NV Afvalzorg Noord-Holland Meesterlottelaan 301 2012 JJ Haarlem / NL | [1998/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odekerken, Gabriel Cornelis Maria Nicolaas Eikenlaan 10 6721 DM Bennekom / NL | 02 /
Poelen, Johannus Gerardus Maria Bruuk 98 6562 KN Groesbeek / NL | 03 /
Reeuwijk, Anthonius Franciscus Adrianus Hertog Eduartstraat 4 6915 XS Lobith / NL | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter, P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 97203152.0 | 10.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | NL19961004243 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: NL 1004243 | [1998/17] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836806 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/00, A23K1/10, A23K1/14, A23N17/00 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
A23N17/002 (EP);
A23K10/26 (EP);
A23K10/37 (EP);
Y02P60/87 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, LU [1999/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umwandeln von feuchten organischen Abfällen in Tierfutter | [1998/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for converting wet organic wastes into animal feed | [1999/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de transformation de déchets organiques humides en aliment pour animaux | [1998/17] |
Former [1998/17] | Method and apparatus for converting wet organic wasted into animal feed | Examination procedure | 23.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/40] | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0338615 (STORK DUKE BV [NL]) [Y] 1,4 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 2 * * claims 1,5,6 *; | [Y]DE19503228 (RETHMANN TBA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 23 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 49 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 22 * * claims 1,5,6,10,12 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4444448 (BKT BIEGER KG [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * column 1, line 3 - line 14 * * column 3, line 44 - line 49 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 2 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0588152 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 4 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB1511644 (RICHLAND RESOURCES LTD) [A] 1,4 * page 1, line 21 - line 69 * * page 2, line 8 - line 10 * * page 2, line 25 - line 27 * * claims 1,8-10 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB1547582 (SANDO IRON WORKS CO) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 23 - line 82 * * claims 1,2,4-7,9,10 *; | [A]EP0542458 (SSDE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 1 - line 42 * * claim 13 *; | [A]FR2631520 (CHEDHOMME ARNAUD [FR]) [A] 1,3 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]RU2007098 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 33, Database accession no. 94-270279, XP002035640 & RU2007098 C 19940215 (MALOFEEV V I) [A] 1 * abstract * |