EP0892208 - Means for improving the diffusion in a sorbent bed of a gas storage and dispensing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY MATERIALS, INC. 7 Commerce Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [1999/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olander, Karl W. 19616 Golf Boulevard, Apt 301 Indian Shore, Florida 33785 / US | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Gee, Steven William D.W. & S.W. GEE 1 South Lynn Gardens London Road Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Gee, Steven William 1 South Lynn Gardens, London Road Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 97203212.2 | 16.10.1997 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | US19970859173 | 20.05.1997 Original published format: US 859173 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892208 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892208 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F17C11/00 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
F17C11/00 (EP,US);
F17C13/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [1999/33] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mittel zur Verbesserung der Diffusion im Sorbentbett einer Gasspeicher- und Gasabgabevorrichtung | [1999/03] | English: | Means for improving the diffusion in a sorbent bed of a gas storage and dispensing system | [1999/03] | French: | Moyens pour améliorer la diffusion dans le lit de sorbent d'un système de stockage et de distribution de gaz | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1997 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 07.11.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2580376 (APPLIC GAZ SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,7-11,14,15 * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [X]DE4439782 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,10,14 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]FR2336628 (IND GMBH ET CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0093885 (THYSSEN INDUSTRIE [DE]); | [A]FR2444881 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]JPS59183196 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850222), vol. 009, no. 042, Database accession no. (M - 359), & JP59183196 A 19841018 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] * abstract * |