EP0840418 - Combination of a flush mounted box and an apparatus for electrical installation, and associated box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V. Kunststoffenindustrie Attema Schelluinsestraat 68 NL-4203 NN Gorinchem / NL | [1998/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Hoog, Antonie 15, De Wetering 4213 DE Dalem / NL | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Mertens, Hans Victor Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) J.J. Viottastraat 31 1071 JP Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Mertens, Hans Victor van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 97203342.7 | 29.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | NL19961004392 | 30.10.1996 Original published format: NL 1004392 | [1998/19] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840418 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
H02G3/18 (EP);
H02G3/081 (EP);
H02G3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, LU, NL [1999/03] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kombination einer Einbaudose und elektrischen Installationsmaterial, und Einbaudose für Benützung in einer solchen Kombination | [1998/19] | English: | Combination of a flush mounted box and an apparatus for electrical installation, and associated box | [1998/19] | French: | Combinaison d'un boîtier à encastre et d'un appareil d'installation électrique, et boîtier associé | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 09.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/36] | Request for further processing for: | 31.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1922588U (FRANZ & RUTENBECK [DE]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]DE3507897 (ACKERMANN ALBERT GMBH CO) [A] 1-5,8,11,13 * the whole document * |