EP0845587 - Internal combustion engine intake port flow determination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2000/48] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maloney, Peter James 2021 Mayburn Dearborn, Michigan 48128 / US | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97203481.3 | 10.11.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | US19960759277 | 02.12.1996 Original published format: US 759277 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0845587 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0845587 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/18, F02D41/24, F02D41/14 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
F02D41/1448 (EP,US);
F02D41/1401 (EP,US);
F02D41/18 (EP,US);
G01F1/86 (EP,US);
G01F1/88 (EP,US);
F02D13/0207 (EP,US);
F02D13/0219 (EP,US);
F02D13/0238 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1425 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1433 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0402 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0411 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/23] | F02D41/18, F02D41/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/34] |
Former [2000/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durchflussbestimmung in einer Einlassöffnung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1998/23] | English: | Internal combustion engine intake port flow determination | [1998/23] | French: | Détermination du débit d'admission d'un moteur à combustion | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 27.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4404946 (HOARD JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 4 * * column 5, line 7 - column 7, line 32 *; | [A]US5003950 (KATO SENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5205260 (TAKAHASHI SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7,8 * column 2, line 38 - line 65 * * column 5, line 20 - line 40 * * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 20 * * column 8, line 1 - column 9, line 42; figure - *; | [A] - BIDAN P ET AL, "NONLINEAR CONTROL OF A SPARK-IGNITION ENGINE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONTROL SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY, (19950301), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1063-6536, pages 4 - 13, XP000508605 [A] 1,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/87.370704 | [A] - LENZ U ET AL, "ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE FOR COMBUSTION ENGINE CONTROL", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, (19960101), pages 107 - 116, XP000770141 [A] 1,7 * page 108, column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 23 * * page 111, column 2, line 24 - page 116, column 1, line 5; figures 1-3,10,13 * |