EP0846876 - Self-Lubricating Rivet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation 150 Dey Road Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation 150 Dey Road Wayne, New Jersey 07470 / US | ||
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states NORTON PERFORMANCE PLASTICS CORPORATION 150 Dey Road Wayne, New Jersey 07470 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenac, Albert 105 Woodlawn Avenue Upr. Montclair, New Jersey 07043 / US | 02 /
Portelli, Louis V. 139 Fornelius Avenue Clifton, New Jersey 07013 / US | 03 /
Szwedziuk, Antoni Jan 1091 Pompton Avenue, 2B Cedar Grove, New Jersey 07009 / US | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 97203737.8 | 28.11.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | US19960763637 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: US 763637 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0846876 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0846876 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846876 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/04, F16B19/10, F16B19/08, F16C11/04, F16C33/20 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
F16C11/04 (EP,US);
A44B99/00 (KR);
A44B17/00 (KR);
B21J15/04 (EP,US);
B21J15/046 (EP,US);
F16B19/10 (EP,US);
F16B5/04 (KR);
F16C11/02 (EP,US);
Y10S411/903 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49655 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4984 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4986 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/24] | F16B5/04, F16B19/10, F16B19/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/16] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Selbstschmierende Niete | [1998/24] | English: | Self-Lubricating Rivet | [1998/24] | French: | Rivet autolubrifiant | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 29.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Request for further processing for: | 20.05.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4202243 (LEONHARDT ROBERT F [US]) [A] 1-45 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4388744 (PANTKE REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [A]US5015136 (VETTER GREGORY J [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [A]US5033900 (PINE JAMES J [US]) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4417279 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [A] 1-45* figures 2,7,8 * | by applicant | US5573846 | - CRC HANDBOOK OF CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS (62ND EDITION, 1981-1982) |