EP0849633 - Photographic recording materials and their use in redox amplification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Codling, Adrian James Bower c/o Kodak Ltd., Headstone Drive Harrow, HA1 4TY / GB | 02 /
Fyson, John Richard c/o Kodak Ltd., Headstone Drive Harrow, HA1 4TY / GB | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1998/26] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patent Departement (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97203925.9 | 15.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | GB19960026331 | 19.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9626331 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849633 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849633 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30, G03C7/32 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
G03C7/3003 (EP,US);
G03C7/3017 (EP,US);
G03C7/42 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03517 (EP,US);
G03C2007/3025 (EP,US);
G03C7/3022 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Photographische Aufzeichnungsmaterialien und deren Verwendung in einem Redox-Verstärkungsverfahren | [1998/26] | English: | Photographic recording materials and their use in redox amplification | [1998/26] | French: | Matériaux d'enregistrement photographiques et leur utilisation dans un procédé d'intensification par oxydoréduction | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Request for further processing for: | 04.07.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0722118 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10 * example 5 * * claims 5,7,8,16,17 *; | [A]US5354647 (FYSON JOHN R [GB]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 11 - line 60 * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 15 *; | [A]US5374505 (HEINECKE JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 10 * * example 1 *; | [XA]US5110714 (FURUSAWA GENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 6,7,10 * column 2, line 23 - line 41 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 51 * * column 6, line 6 - column 11, line 21 * * examples 1,2 * [A] 1-5; | [A]US4868099 (RENNER GUENTER [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 33 * * table 2 * |