EP0852312 - Thermal isolation coupling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senior Engineering Investments AG Mühlentalsträsschen 9 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [1998/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davey, Mark John 204 Timber Oaks Drive North Aurora, Illinois 60542 / US | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1998/28] | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97204151.1 | 21.12.1992 | [1998/28] | Priority number, date | US19920822618 | 17.01.1992 Original published format: US 822618 | [1998/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0852312 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0852312 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/252, F16L37/084, F16L37/088 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
F16L41/088 (EP,US);
F16L37/252 (EP,KR,US);
F16L37/091 (EP,US);
F16L37/0985 (EP,US);
F16L41/08 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1998/28] | F16L37/252, F16L37/084 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/28] | Title | German: | Verbindungssystem mit thermischer Isolierung | [1998/28] | English: | Thermal isolation coupling system | [1998/28] | French: | Système de raccordement avec isolation thermique | [1998/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 30.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | 28.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92311643.8 / EP0551755 | Request for further processing for: | 28.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2001 | 31.12.2001 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3672708 (ZEMBERRY WILLIAM L) [A] 1 * figures 1-12; claims 1-13 *; | [A]FR1435463 (WAVIN BV) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE3341029 (VOSS ARMATUREN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AP]US5098133 (GLOVER JEFFREY [US]) [AP] 1 * figures 1-6; claims 1-20 * |