EP0802147 - Running gear, particularly for chain hoist and/or towing cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demag Cranes & Components GmbH Ruhrstrasse 28 58300 Wetter / DE | [2002/20] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gersemsky, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Weg zum Poethen 113 58313 Herdecke / DE | 02 /
Schütt, Hartmut Grundschötteler Strasse 114 58300 Wetter / DE | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Moser, Jörg Michael Moser & Götze Patentanwälte Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Moser, Jörg Michael Rosastrasse 6 A 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2003/06] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1997/43] | Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 97250120.9 | 16.04.1997 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | DE1996117104 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19617104 | [1997/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802147 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802147 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66C11/06 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
B66C11/06 (EP);
B66C9/08 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/45] |
Former [1997/43] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Fahrwerk, insbesondere für Kettenzüge und/oder Schleppkabel | [1997/43] | English: | Running gear, particularly for chain hoist and/or towing cable | [1997/43] | French: | Train de roulement, en particulier pour palan à chaîne et/ou câble de remorquage | [1997/43] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 27.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 26.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Request for further processing for: | 11.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.12.2002 | GB | 16.04.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 16.04.2003 | |
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 27.06.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2353622 (MANNESMANN AG) [X] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 9; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [A] 3; | [XA]DE2341670 (SWF SUEDDEUTSCHE WINDEN U FOER) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1-5; claims 1,2 * [A] 3; | [X]DE1481729 (ALLMÄNNA SVENSKA ELEKTRISKA AG) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1767562U (LAUF BUNGERT & WINNESBERG K G [DE]) [X] 1,4 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [XA]GB1307677 (MATTERSON LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [AD]DE4109971 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [AD] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5445080 (AUSTIN ROBERT [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 1 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2318099 (DEFLEUR ETS [FR]) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document * |