EP0814197 - Track in stable position made of precast concrete parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/52] | Truck in stable position made of precast concrete parts | ||
[2001/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROJEKTGEMEINSCHAFT FESTE FAHRBAHN SYSTEM SATO GLEISROST MIT BETON- ODER STAHLSCHWELLEN ASPHALT- ODER BETONFAHRBAHN GMBH Böhlerstrasse 35-37 08527 Plauen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states Projektgemeinschaft Feste Fahrbahn System SATO Gleisrost mit Beton- oder Stahlschwellen Asphalt- oder Betonfahrbahn GmbH Böhlerstrasse 35-37 08527 Plauen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frenzel, Jürgen Alter Sonnenbergweg 7 31084 Freden / DE | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | Effert, Bressel und Kollegen Radickestrasse 48 D-12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 97250181.1 | 11.06.1997 | [1997/52] | Priority number, date | DE1996125249 | 17.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19625249 | [1997/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814197 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814197 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E01B1/00, E01B19/00 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
E01B19/00 (EP);
E01B1/002 (EP);
E01B1/007 (EP);
E01B2204/07 (EP);
E01B2204/11 (EP);
E01B5/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, LI, LU, NL [1998/37] |
Former [1997/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lagestabiles Gleis aus Betonfertigteilen | [1997/52] | English: | Track in stable position made of precast concrete parts | [2001/17] | French: | Voie à position stable à piecès préfabriquées en béton | [1997/52] |
Former [1997/52] | Truck in stable position made of precast concrete parts | Examination procedure | 17.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 27.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.01.2002 | ES | 30.07.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 23.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3134473 (DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG [DE]) [AD] 1,7,8 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 8; figure - *; | [A]AT382178B (GETZNER CHEMIE GMBH & CO [AT]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 40; figure - *; | [AD]DE3810700 (KUNZ ALFRED & CO [DE]) [AD] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 37 - column 4, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE3809466 (KUNZ ALFRED & CO [DE]) [AD] 1,7 * column 6, line 17 - line 28; figures 5-7 *; | [A]DE3833720 (KUNZ ALFRED & CO [DE]); | [AD]DE3827547 (ZUEBLIN AG [DE]) [AD] 1,8 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 56; figure - *; | [AD]DE4041237 (SALZGITTER PEINE STAHLWERKE [DE]) [AD] 1,3,8 * column 1, line 39 - column 4, line 2; figure - *; | [AD]EP0546380 (GETZNER CHEMIE GMBH & CO [AT]) [AD] 1 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 28; figure - *; | [A]DE9417008U (BETONWERK RETHWISCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 5 - page 9; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE4417402 (GRUENZWEIG & HARTMANN MONTAGE [DE]) [AD] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 22 - column 4, line 65; figure - *; | [AD]DE29513062U (WAYSS & FREYTAG AG [DE]); | [A]DE29515935U (HOLZMANN PHILIPP AG [DE], et al) |