EP0927721 - Novel vitamine D derivatives having phosphorus atoms in the side chains, intermediates for their preparation and their use for the preparation of drugs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Müllerstrasse 178 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinmeyer, Andreas, Dr. Seeburger Strasse 6 13581 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Neef, Günter, Dr. Markgraf-Albrecht-Strasse 4 10711 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kirsch, Gerald, Dr. Luciusstrasse 6b 14199 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Schwarz, Katica Kaiser-Friedrich-Strasse 1 10585 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Wiesinger, Herbert, Dr. Luitpoldstrasse 36 10781 Berlin / DE | 06 /
Haberey, Martin, Dr. Steinstrasse 1 12169 Berlin / DE | 07 /
Fähnrich, Marianne, Dr. Letteallee 48 13409 Berlin / DE | 08 /
Langer, Gernot, Dr. Wilhelmshavener Strasse 63 10551 Berlin / DE | [1999/27] | Application number, filing date | 97250374.2 | 17.12.1997 | [1999/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0927721 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/40, A61K31/66, C07F9/53, C07C401/00 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
C07F9/532 (EP);
C07C401/00 (EP);
C07F9/383 (EP);
C07F9/386 (EP);
C07F9/4018 (EP);
C07F9/404 (EP);
C07F9/405 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neue Vitamin D-Derivate mit Phosphoratomen in den Seitenketten, Zwischenprodukte bei ihrer Herstellung und die Verwendung zur Herstellung von Arzneimitteln | [1999/27] | English: | Novel vitamine D derivatives having phosphorus atoms in the side chains, intermediates for their preparation and their use for the preparation of drugs | [1999/27] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés de la vitamine D ayant des atomes de phosphore sur les chaines latérales, intermédiaires pour leur préparation et leur utilisation pour la préparation de médicaments | [1999/27] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1997 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 17.12.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/34] | 29.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9407853 (SCHERING AG) [DY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9700242 (SCHERING AG) [DY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4336429 (SCHERING AG) [X] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0633245 (DUPHAR INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH B.V.) [X] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4230700 (MARION D. FRANCIS) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9009992 (LEO PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LTD.) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |