EP0786310 - Wafer polishing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2000/12] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states ONTRAK SYSTEMS, INC. 1010 Rincon Circle San Jose, California 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Volodarsky, Konstantin 1721 Rivera Street San Francisco, California 94116 / US | 02 /
Weldon, David Edwin 23613 Skyview Terrace Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Bucks, Teresa Anne, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Bucks, Teresa Anne, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1997/31] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300080.5 | 08.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | US19960590861 | 24.01.1996 Original published format: US 590861 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786310 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786310 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B24B37/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/31] | Extension states | AL | 20.01.1997 | LT | 20.01.1997 | LV | 20.01.1997 | RO | 20.01.1997 | SI | 20.01.1997 | Title | German: | Halbleiterscheiben-Polierkopf | [1997/31] | English: | Wafer polishing head | [1997/31] | French: | Tête de polissage pour plaquette semi-conductrice | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.2002 | CH | 04.12.2002 | FI | 04.12.2002 | GR | 04.12.2002 | LI | 04.12.2002 | IE | 08.01.2003 | LU | 08.01.2003 | MC | 31.01.2003 | DK | 04.03.2003 | SE | 04.03.2003 | PT | 05.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
LU | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
IE | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | SE | 04.03.2003 | |
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 04.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59187456 ; | [A]JPS55157473 ; | [PX]EP0747167 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [PX] 1-13 * abstract *; | [PX]US5584751 (KOBAYASHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0768148 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [E] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850306), vol. 009, no. 051, Database accession no. (M - 361), & JP59187456 A 19841024 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1-3,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810228), vol. 005, no. 033, Database accession no. (M - 057), & JP55157473 A 19801208 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1-3,11 * abstract * | by applicant | US5329732 | US5329734 | US19940287658 |