EP0785592 - A dielectric resonator structure providing harmonic attenuation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LK-PRODUCTS OY Takatie 6 SF-90440 Kempele / FI | [1997/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Närhi, Harri Pihlajakuja 13 E 10 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | 02 /
Hiltunen, Mika Torpparintie 3 91500 Muhos / FI | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Nordin, Leif Göran, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Nordin, Leif Göran, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1997/30] | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al NOKIA MOBILE PHONES, Patent Department, St. Georges Court, St. Georges Road, 9 High Street Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300227.2 | 15.01.1997 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | FI19960000277 | 19.01.1996 Original published format: FI 960277 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0785592 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/205, H01P7/04, H01P1/212 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
H01P1/212 (EP);
H01P1/2056 (EP);
H01P7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, SE [1997/30] | Title | German: | Dielektrische Resonatorstruktur mit Dämpfung der Harmonischen | [1997/30] | English: | A dielectric resonator structure providing harmonic attenuation | [1997/30] | French: | Structure diélectrique de résonateur avec atténuation des harmoniques | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 03.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/05] | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0524011 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 21 - line 40 * * column 11, line 52 - column 12, line 19; figures 7,12 *; | [A]US5436602 (MCVEETY THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,13 * column 2, line 21 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS59119901 ; | [A]EP0645836 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1,13 * column 1, line 8 - line 47 * * column 3, line 23 - line 52; figures 2,5 *; | [PX]EP0743696 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [PX] 1,12,13 * the whole document * | [A] - Y. ISOTA ET AL., "A grooved monoblock comb-line filter suppressing the third harmonics", 1987 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM-DIGEST, LAS VEGAS (US), (19870609), pages 383 - 386, XP002030374 [A] 1 * page 383, column R, line 1 - page 384, column L, line 5; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841102), vol. 8, no. 239, Database accession no. (E - 276)<1676> , & JP59119901 A 19840711 (FUJITSU K.K.) [A] 1,2,5,8,10,13 * abstract * | by applicant | US4506241 | US4455503 | US4431977 |