EP0788065 - Apparatus and method for specifying presentation of multimedia message components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jennings, Terry Don 11559 Chase Way Westminster, Colorado 80020 / US | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1997/32] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300369.2 | 21.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | US19960590031 | 02.02.1996 Original published format: US 590031 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788065 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0788065 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0788065 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F17/60 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
H04L51/10 (US)
|
Former IPC [1997/32] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/32] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Spezifizieren der Präsentation von Multimedianachrichten-Teilen | [1997/32] | English: | Apparatus and method for specifying presentation of multimedia message components | [1997/32] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour spécifier la présentation des composants de messages multimedias | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.06.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 20.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04356844 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,8; | [A]WO9525312 (AIRWORKS MEDIA SERVICES LTD [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 11 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 13 *; | US5572728 [ ] (TADA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract ** column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 67 *; | [Y] - TAKESHI YONEDA ET AL, "A NEW COMMUNICATION TOOL: TIME DEPENDENT MULTIMEDIA DOCUMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS, YOKOHAMA, JUNE 9 - 12, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920609), no. CONF. 12, pages 90 - 97, XP000341001 [Y] 1-10 * page 91, column R, line 17 - page 95, column L, line 24 * | [Y] - KEITH EDWARDS W, "THE DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION OF THE MONTAGE MULTIMEDIA MAIL SYSTEM", COMMUNICATIONS FOR DISTRIBUTED APPLICATIONS AND SYSTEMS, CHAPEL HILL, APR. 18 - 19, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910418), no. CONF. 4, pages 47 - 57, XP000278438 [Y] 1-10 * page 47, column L, line 1 - line 22 * * page 51, column L, line 33 - page 52, column L, line 43 * | by applicant | US5388264 | US5420801 | JP19850030244 |