EP0787769 - Impact modified polycarbonate/polyester compositions with high weather resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/32] | Impact modified polycarbonate and/or polyester compositions with high weather resistance | ||
[2002/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whalen, David 1608 Hawthorne Drive Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620 / US | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300413.8 | 23.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | US19960595698 | 02.02.1996 Original published format: US 595698 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0787769 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0787769 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787769 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08L69/00, // (C08L67/02, 51:04),(C08L69/00, 51:04),(C08L67/02, 69:00, 51:04),(C08L69/00, 67:02, 51:04) | [1999/01] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP);
C08L69/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L51/00 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08L51/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [1997/32] | C08L67/02, C08L69/00, // (C08L67/02, 51:04),(C08L69/00, 51:00),(C08L67/02, 69:00, 51:04),(C08L69/00, 67:02, 51:04) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/32] | Title | German: | Schlagzähe Polycarbonat-/ Polyestermischungen mit hoher Wetterbeständigkeit | [2002/03] | English: | Impact modified polycarbonate/polyester compositions with high weather resistance | [2002/03] | French: | Compositions résistantes aux chocs et aux intempèries à base de polyester et de polycarbonate | [2002/03] |
Former [1997/32] | Schlagzähe Polycarbonat- und/oder polyestermischungen mit hoher Wetterbeständigkeit | ||
Former [1997/32] | Impact modified polycarbonate and/or polyester compositions with high weather resistance | ||
Former [1997/32] | Compositions résistantes aux chocs et aux intempèries à base de polyester et/ou de polycarbonate | Examination procedure | 30.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0284086 (SUMITOMO NAUGATUCK [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * example 3; claim 1 *; | [X]JPH03244658 ; | [XY]EP0265275 (CELANESE ENG RESINS INC [US]) [X] 1,7-10 * example 3; claims 1,6,9-11 * [Y] 2-5; | [Y]FR2197930 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-5,10 * example 1; claims 1-4 *; | [D]US3864428 (NAKAMURA YOSITUGU, et al); | [XY]US4656225 (BOUTNI OMAR M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9 * examples 3-5; claims 1-5 * * column 6, line 46 - line 60 * [Y] 2,4,5,10; | [X]EP0244857 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-9 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9010674 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1,3,7-10 * examples 1-3; claims 1-3 * * page 8, line 8 - line 24 * * page 13, line 17 - page 14, line 16 *; | [X]JPS59226054 ; | [X]JPS63234055 ; | [A]JPS61200107 ; | [A]JPH01165658 ; | [DA]US4493921 (WEFER JOHN M [US]) [DA] 1-5,7 * example 5; claim 1 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 50, Database accession no. 91-365124, XP002069316 & JPH03244658 A 19911031 (TOYOBO KK) [X] 1,7 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 06, Database accession no. 85-033536, XP002069311 & JPS59226054 A 19841219 (SUMITOMO NAUGATUCK KK) [X] 1,3,7,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 45, Database accession no. 88-318196, XP002083200 & JPS63234055 A 19880929 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1,3,7,10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 42, Database accession no. 86-275172, XP002069313 & JPS61200107 A 19860904 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 32, Database accession no. 89-230913, XP002074850 & JPH01165658 A 19890629 (TEIJIN LTD.) [A] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * | Examination | US4780506 | by applicant | US4264487 | US4780506 | US2465319 | US4034016 | US4098750 | US3169121 | US4550138 | US4485212 | US4493921 | US3864428 | US4180434 | US4257937 |