EP0786622 - Headlamp with complex reflector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visteon-Autopal, s.r.o. Luzická 14 741 01 Novy Jicin / CZ | [2006/45] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states AUTOPAL S.R.O. Suvorovova 195 CZ-741 11 Novy Jicin / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cejnek, Milan U Jicinky 8 741 01 Novy Jicin / CZ | 02 /
Pekarkova, Dana Loucka 8 741 01 Novy Jicin / CZ | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300436.9 | 23.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | CZ19960000257 | 29.01.1996 Original published format: CZ 25796 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786622 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786622 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/06 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
F21S41/336 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/31] | F21M3/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/31] | Title | German: | Scheinwerfer mit Mehrflächen-Reflektor | [1997/31] | English: | Headlamp with complex reflector | [1997/31] | French: | Projecteur comportant un réflecteur avec plusieurs secteurs | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.04.2006 | [2008/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2107896 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [A] 1 * page 10, line 23 - line 26 * * page 12, line 21 - line 29; figures 1-3,9 *; | [Y]EP0257946 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-5,7 * column 5, line 32 - line 52 * * column 6, line 51 - line 61; figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]DE3900910 (AUTOPAL NP [CS]) [Y] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US4899261 (BLUSSEAU ERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 26 - line 37; figures 10-12 *; | [A]EP0384589 (CARELLO LIGHTING PLC [GB]) [A] 2,3* column 4, line 2 - line 22; figure 1 * |