EP0786272 - Golf club sighting and alignment system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantum Leap Golf Company, L.L.C. 117 AA Young's Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07976 / US | [1997/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryan, William H. 101 Delafield Avenue Staten Island, NY 10301 / US | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300460.9 | 24.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | US19960591072 | 25.01.1996 Original published format: US 591072 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0786272 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0786272 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/36, A63B53/04 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
A63B69/3632 (EP,US);
A63B53/0441 (EP,US);
A63B53/0466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [1997/31] | Title | German: | Ausrichtungs- und Anvisierungssystem für Golfschläger | [1997/31] | English: | Golf club sighting and alignment system | [1997/31] | French: | Système d'alignement et de visée pour club de golf | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/39] | 19.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.02.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5452897 (MICK PHILLIP J [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 5; figure 3 * * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 6; claim 1 * [A] 5,6; | [A]US3680860 (ELKINS VANCE V JR) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 43 - line 56; figures 1,5 * * column 6, line 37 - line 55 *; | [A]US5429366 (MCCABE TERRILL R [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 2 - line 24; figure 7A * |